U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Hill v. State of Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.