U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Trimp v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Administrative Record]
  • December 02, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 15, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 15, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.