U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-po-05001-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Bancroft
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Minutes - Initial Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MTD]
  • October 22, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.