U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Hale v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 20, 2023: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Administrative Record]
  • November 02, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.