U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Disability Rights Montana v. Gootkin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 10, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Electronic Evidence or Video Conferencing - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Appear]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 01, 2022: [Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Errata - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Redact - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Redact - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Redact - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 09, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 03, 2021: [Redact - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.