U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Hammonds v. Medical Rep. Chase et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.