U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Lout v. State of Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • December 02, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.