U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Duffy et al v. Kaman Aerospace Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 08, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Remark L.R. 5.1 Exhibits]
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury Notes]
  • May 08, 2025: [JERS Electronic List]
  • May 08, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2025: [Witness List - SDM]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment as a Matter of Law - SDM]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 04, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 04, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Jury List]
  • April 28, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Jury Selection - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Jury Trial - Held - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response - MT]
  • April 27, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • April 27, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • April 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 27, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 25, 2025: [Witness List - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Electronic Evidence or Video Conferencing - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Electronic Evidence or Video Conferencing - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [In Limine]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 07, 2025: [Redacted Document]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 10, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • October 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Modify - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • April 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Errata - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Errata - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.