U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Cranska v. UMIA Insurance, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • December 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 28, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 18, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 14, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 08, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 17, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.