U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lonefight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • January 12, 2022: [Summons]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.