U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.