U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Cowger v. Signal Peak Energy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Extending Scheduling Order Deadlines - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Extending Scheduling Order Deadlines - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • November 13, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 11, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.