U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paskiewicz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Appoint Counsel ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.