U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Madill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 23, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.