U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jordan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.