U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montclair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.