U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.