U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tarr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.