U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monahan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.