U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carleton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.