U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Remark - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 15, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 08, 2021: [Appear]
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.