U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:19-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Yaak Valley Forest Council v. Vilsack et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 04, 2022: [Stay]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Use Electronic Evidence or Video Conferencing - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.