U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meeks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2021: [Warrant ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.