U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ludtke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 27, 2022: [Dismiss ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.