U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fredrickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.