U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • December 20, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.