U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Gassman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 17, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 29, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2022: [Amicus Brief - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 10, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 01, 2022: [Amicus Brief - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief ]
  • February 10, 2022: [File Amicus Brief ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • November 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Intervene]
  • November 18, 2021: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 17, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 21, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.