U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Raleigh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Compel ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 01, 2022: [Stipulation - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Vacate]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Suppress ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.