U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ludtke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Staying Case - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.