U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Signal Peak Energy LLC
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Transcript - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 31, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.