U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 29, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.