U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murnion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.