U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Not Afraid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.