U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Wells et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Modify - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 11, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.