U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Sadler v. State of Montana et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 23, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • January 08, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • November 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.