U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Smith v. Montana Board of Pardons and Parole et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 17, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.