U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Lehotsky v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Administrative Record]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 27, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.