U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00110
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Rhodes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Pro Se Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pro Se Answer]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pro Se Response to Order - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 09, 2023: [Pro Se Response to Motion - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Strike - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Pro Se Response to Motion - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pro Se Answer]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Pro Se Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Pro Se Response to Motion - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Pro Se Registration Form]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.