U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Elverud v. Lake County Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Jury Demand]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.