U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Bristol v. Hedick et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 06, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 18, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 07, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.