U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jordan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.