U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Talcott et al v. Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Appear]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 01, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.