U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BIGLEGGINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Appoint Counsel ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.