U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Robertson v. S.T.A.R.T. Facility Program et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • April 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 01, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.