U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Lowdermilk et al v. Lowdermilk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Status Report Order]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 04, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.