U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Gianforte et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Vacate]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.