U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Robertson v. Flathead County Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.