U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Everett v. Holiday Stationstores
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.