U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Blando et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.