U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05187-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Leslie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • December 10, 2021: [Exhibits - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order - MTD]
  • December 09, 2021: [Bench Trial - Held - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 07, 2021: [Appear]
  • October 07, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.